Global Patent Index - EP 0805119 B1

EP 0805119 B1 2000-08-02 - Load pick-up means for standardised load units, particularly containers and exchangeable containers

Title (en)

Load pick-up means for standardised load units, particularly containers and exchangeable containers

Title (de)

Lastaufnahmemittel für normierte Ladungseinheiten, insbesondere Container und Wechselbehälter

Title (fr)

Moyen de prise de charge pour unités de charge normalisées, en particulier conteneurs et conteneurs interchangeables

Publication

EP 0805119 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97250122 A

Priority

DE 19619052 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805119A1] The intermediate cross member (4) and the hydraulic cylinders (8) of the load bearing assembly are located inside the outer contour of the frame (9) when viewed in plan and from the side. The hydraulic cylinders, when viewed in the horizontal position of the frame, are located at the side next to the connecting element (3). A rotating device (6) is located between the connecting element and intermediate cross member and rotates the container (7) around a vertical axis which is located inside the outer contour of the frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/663 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805119 A1 19971105; EP 0805119 B1 20000802; AT 195112 T 20000815; DE 19619052 C1 19971211

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050417

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-04-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2005-04-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2004-04-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040402

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702100

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-07

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195112

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991220

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971125

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE