Global Patent Index - EP 0805195 B1

EP 0805195 B1 2002-09-18 - Used lubricating oil electric power generating process and facility

Title (en)

Used lubricating oil electric power generating process and facility

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen von elektrischer Energie durch gebrauchte Schmieröle und Anlage dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé pour générer de l'énergie électrique à partir d'huile lubrifiante usagée et installation pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0805195 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97500076 A

Priority

ES 9600967 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805195A2] The process consists of submitting waste oils, having checked the quality of and accepted the oils, to a heat refining which yields a fuel that is similar to commercial light diesel oil as an end product, which allows diesel motors in an electric power production plant to be supplied directly. The facility has an oil storage yard (9), with a tank (4) at which dirty oil arrives after being accepted, from which it is supplied to dirty oil storage tanks (5) that in turn supply the same to the oil treatment plant (6) from which they move on to storage tanks (8) and finally to an electric power production plant (11) supply system to supply the electric power producing motor generators (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 175/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/0025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GR NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805195 A2 19971105; EP 0805195 A3 19980107; EP 0805195 B1 20020918; DE 69715506 D1 20021024; DE 69715506 T2 20030522; ES 2117942 A1 19980816; ES 2117942 B1 19990416; IT 1284946 B1 19980528; IT MI962119 A1 19980413; NO 971967 A 19971030; NO 971967 D0 19970428; PT 805195 E 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-10-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061024

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-05-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-12-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715506 20021024

2002-10-16 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER

- Owner name: ENVIROIL VASCA, S.A.

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GR NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENVIROIL VASCA, S.A.

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991222

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980330

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK GR NL PT SE

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK GR NL PT SE