Global Patent Index - EP 0805254 B1

EP 0805254 B1 2002-11-06 - Method of manufacturing insulating glass panels with thermoplastic spacer

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing insulating glass panels with thermoplastic spacer

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Isolierglasscheiben mit thermoplastischem Abstandhalter

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de vitres isolantes à écarteur thermoplastique

Publication

EP 0805254 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105195 A

Priority

DE 19617198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805254A2] The method involves application of a thermoplastic strand (3) along the edges of a first pane, connection of the ends of the strand and placing a second pane on the first for adhesion by a thermo-plastic distance holder. The distance between the two glass panes (1) is reduced to a predetermined dimension, so that the thermo-plastic strand is compressed. The thermo-plastic strand (3) is formed sectionally with reduced width, so that the reduced width is greater than the predetermined dimension. The thermo-plastic strand is prefabricated and is formed in distances with reduced width (6). The thermo-plastic strand is directly extruded onto the first glass pane and in its extrusion is sectionally formed with the reduced width. It is produced with a nozzle, the mouth of which is narrowed on a time basis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/673; E06B 3/677

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/673 (2006.01); E06B 3/677 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/6775 (2013.01); E06B 3/6733 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805254 A2 19971105; EP 0805254 A3 19990922; EP 0805254 B1 20021106; AT 227390 T 20021115; DE 19617198 A1 19971113

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 227390 T

- Effective date: 20170327

2017-03-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708644

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708644 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227390 T 20021115

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020521

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

1999-09-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6E 06B 3/673 A, 6E 06B 3/677 B

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE