Global Patent Index - EP 0805255 B1

EP 0805255 B1 2002-09-18 - Fire protection door

Title (en)

Fire protection door

Title (de)

Feuerschutztür

Title (fr)

Porte coupe-feu

Publication

EP 0805255 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107322 A

Priority

DE 19617624 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805255A1] The fore door comprises a door panel with all-round covering and a frame forming a stop for the covering with its outside top and sides. When viewed in the horizontal projection, between the lower covering (18) and the lower frame section (3c) a vertical clearance (b) is provided. The vertical distance (d) between the lower frame section (3c) and the frame section wall (32c,23c) opposite to the upper door rabbet is greater than the complete height of the door panel. An additional frame part (12) is provided, which from below can be applied against the upper frame section and in the applied position reduces the distance (d). The frame part can be fixed releasably or permanently in the upper area of the frame by means of screws.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16; E06B 1/52; E06B 3/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/52 (2006.01); E06B 3/82 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/16 (2013.01); E06B 1/526 (2013.01); E06B 3/82 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805255 A1 19971105; EP 0805255 B1 20020918; DE 19617624 A1 19971106

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708228

- Effective date: 20121201

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708228 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971201

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT