Global Patent Index - EP 0805258 A3

EP 0805258 A3 2000-04-12 - Reversible boring ram

Title (en)

Reversible boring ram

Title (de)

Umsteuerbares Rammbohrgerät

Title (fr)

Mouton de forage réversible

Publication

EP 0805258 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97106977 A

Priority

DE 19617603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805258A2] Connected with the control air conduit (19) is a regulating chamber. Connected with the control tube is a forward flow chamber. The control casing (10) is fitted with an inner collar (13) between two outer collars (11,12) of the control tube (4). In the control tube in the area of the one outer collar (11) is a control air channel (16) and in the area of the other outer collar (12) is an operating air hole (20). The control air channel is connected with a control air conduit running in the control tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 4/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 4/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 4/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19617603 C1 19970918; AU 1994597 A 19971106; AU 720846 B2 20000615; CA 2204230 A1 19971102; EP 0805258 A2 19971105; EP 0805258 A3 20000412; EP 0805258 B1 20031029; PL 183735 B1 20020731; PL 319720 A1 19971110; US 5954145 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170425

2017-05-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170425

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020813

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB LI