Global Patent Index - EP 0805315 A3

EP 0805315 A3 2001-04-25 - Ventilator frame profile, in particular for venting arrangement of fumes and hot exhaust gases

Title (en)

Ventilator frame profile, in particular for venting arrangement of fumes and hot exhaust gases

Title (de)

Lüfterrahmenprofil, insbesondere für eine Rauch- und Wärmeabzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Profilé de cadre pour ventilateur, en particulier pour un dispositif d'élimination des fumées et des gaz d'échappement chauds

Publication

EP 0805315 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97106072 A

Priority

DE 19617574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805315A2] The air exhauster frame profile (7) comprises a first section (13) made of extruded aluminium. The profile has an outer first part (8) with a box-shaped cross-section with a second section (9) with a C-shaped cross-section connected on the inside in one piece and which can house the upper cross member (39). The outer wall (11) of the outer first part of the first section is extended out at the bottom over the box-shaped cross-section so that at least one side section of a profiled hinge (5) can be fitted to the extension.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/18; E04D 13/03; F24F 7/02; F24F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/68 (2006.01); F23L 13/02 (2006.01); F24D 19/10 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/14 (2013.01); F24F 7/02 (2013.01); F24F 13/1406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805315 A2 19971105; EP 0805315 A3 20010425; EP 0805315 B1 20040728; AT 272195 T 20040815; CZ 292501 B6 20031015; CZ 9701334 A3 19971112; DE 19617574 C1 19971127; DK 0805315 T3 20040906; ES 2221001 T3 20041216; HU 219554 B 20010528; HU 9700835 A1 19971128; HU 9700835 D0 19970630; PL 184179 B1 20020930; PL 319740 A1 19971110

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59711799

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140414

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120414

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120414

2012-11-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GRASL ANDREAS

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110502

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090415

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090415

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GRASL, ANDREAS

- Free text: GRASL, ANDREAS#WIENER STRASSE 23#3452 HEILIGENEICH (AT) -TRANSFER TO- GRASL, ANDREAS#WIENER STRASSE 23#3452 HEILIGENEICH (AT)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041228

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221001 T3

2004-10-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-10-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-09-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711799 P 20040902

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040728

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 13/18 A, 7F 24F 7/02 B, 7F 24F 13/14 B, 7E 04D 13/03 B

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE