Global Patent Index - EP 0805321 B1

EP 0805321 B1 2001-12-05 - Cooling and/or freezing apparatus

Title (en)

Cooling and/or freezing apparatus

Title (de)

Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de réfrigération et/ou de congélation

Publication

EP 0805321 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96114834 A

Priority

  • DE 19617812 A
  • DE 19628278 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805321A1] The device has an inner chamber, closed by a door or lid and with at least partially cooled surfaces which are cooled by an intermittently operating cooling device. The inner chamber is connected via a connecting aperture to the ambient atmosphere, whereby the air exchanged via the aperture can be adjusted to a desired degree of dryness. A regeneratable drying agent (26) is arranged in the connecting aperture (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/047 (2013.01); F25D 2400/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805321 A1 19971105; EP 0805321 B1 20011205; AT 210268 T 20011215; ES 2169187 T3 20020701

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160917

2016-12-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161227

2016-09-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608375

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151001

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070916

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LIEBHERR-WERK *LIENZ G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060920

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169187 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608375 20020117

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210268 T 20011215

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991223

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971202

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL PT