Global Patent Index - EP 0805330 B1

EP 0805330 B1 2001-12-19 - Heat exchanger enabling leak test of chambers in tank separated by single partition

Title (en)

Heat exchanger enabling leak test of chambers in tank separated by single partition

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher, der eine Dichtheitsprüfung einer durch eine Trennplatte getrennte Endkammer ermöglicht

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur permettant de tester l'étanchéité des compartiments d'un collecteur séparé par une partition

Publication

EP 0805330 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97302895 A

Priority

JP 13260296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805330A2] In a heat exchanger comprising a tank (61) having a tank wall, and a partition plate (11) disposed within the tank (61) and sealed to an inner surface of the tank wall to form two chambers partitioned by the partition plate (11), the tank (61) is formed with a groove (614) in the inner surface of the tank (61) along an outer peripheral surface (11a) of the partition plate (11) to thereby form a space (616) which is closed by the outer peripheral surface (lla) and sealed from the two chambers, and a communication hole (618) is formed in the tank wall for communication between the space (616) and the outside of the tank (61), so as to enable the sealing test of the partition plate (11) through the communication hole (618). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0243 (2013.01); F28F 9/0212 (2013.01); F28F 9/0219 (2013.01); F28F 2200/00 (2013.01); F28F 2265/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805330 A2 19971105; EP 0805330 A3 19981014; EP 0805330 B1 20011219; DE 69709229 D1 20020131; DE 69709229 T2 20020725; JP H09296992 A 19971118

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69709229

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-04-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050428

2003-12-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-12-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030428

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020424

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020405

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709229 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990412

1998-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE