Global Patent Index - EP 0805333 B1

EP 0805333 B1 2000-11-08 - Method for creating a decoy target

Title (en)

Method for creating a decoy target

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bereitstellen eines Scheinziels

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la création d'une cible artificielle

Publication

EP 0805333 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105393 A

Priority

DE 19617701 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805333A2] The method involves simultaneously activating a material to radiate in the infrared region and reflect in the radio frequency region in the correct position to act as a decoy target. The active material is positioned by a shell which is set in rotation without a shell case enclosing the active material. The active material can be activated and distributed by an activation and distribution device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 9/00; F41H 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41J 2/02 (2006.01); F41H 9/00 (2006.01); F41H 11/02 (2006.01); F42B 12/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 11/02 (2013.01); F41H 9/00 (2013.01); F42B 12/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805333 A2 19971105; EP 0805333 A3 19980114; EP 0805333 B1 20001108; DE 19617701 A1 19971120; DE 19617701 C2 20000113; DK 0805333 T3 20010205; DK 9900457 U1 19991230; EP 1026473 A1 20000809; EP 1026473 B1 20020807; JP 3181240 B2 20010703; JP H112499 A 19990106; SG 55308 A1 19981221; TW 355204 B 19990401; US 5835051 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-04-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170331

2017-04-03 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702585

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH, 83458 SCHNEIZLREUTH, DE

- Document: DE 59702585

2015-08-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702585

- Representative's name: THUL PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE

2005-01-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20040616

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAINS WESSEX LIMITED

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-12-19 [D26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED (DELETED)

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702585 20001214

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-11-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-11-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUCK NEUE TECHNOLOGIEN GMBH

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990325

2000-03-01 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990325

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980709

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB GR IT NL SE