Global Patent Index - EP 0805419 A3

EP 0805419 A3 2000-06-28 - Method for processing data in a mail processing system with a franking machine and arrangement

Title (en)

Method for processing data in a mail processing system with a franking machine and arrangement

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Datenverarbeitung in einem Postverarbeitungssystem mit einer Frankiermaschine und Anordnung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le traitement de l'information dans un système de traitement de courrier avec une machine d'affranchissement et un arrangement

Publication

EP 0805419 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97250132 A

Priority

DE 19617586 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805419A2] The method involves printing out a document including address field and notes, scanning of the notes in a post position, data processing and franking. Postal items are detected in the transport path to the franking machine. Data are accessed in the franking machine according to the detected address and/or notes and customer data automatically entered into the franking machine. Print images specific to the originator can be accessed in a second step involving the alteration of data in non-volatile memory. The data are processed processing in franking mode with customer specific accounting before franking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00032 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0012 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00177 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00274 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00604 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00709 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805419 A2 19971105; EP 0805419 A3 20000628; DE 19617586 A1 19971106; US 6282525 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111031

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030909

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7G 07B 17/02 B

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI