Global Patent Index - EP 0805420 A3

EP 0805420 A3 2000-06-28 - Method and arrangement for processing data in a mail processing system with a franking machine

Title (en)

Method and arrangement for processing data in a mail processing system with a franking machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Datenverarbeitung in einem Postverarbeitungssystem mit einer Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et arrangement pour le traitement de l'information dans un système de traitement de courrier avec une machine d'affranchissement

Publication

EP 0805420 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97250133 A

Priority

DE 19617473 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805420A2] The method involves preparation, printing out a document including address field and notes, scanning of the notes in a post position, data processing and franking. Postal items are detected in the path to the franking machine. Data are accessed in the franking machine according to the detected address and/or notes and the resulting printing data automatically entered into the franking machine. Print images specific to the originator can be accessed in a second step involving the alteration of data in non-volatile memory. The third step involves processing the data and accounting before franking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00322 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00709 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805420 A2 19971105; EP 0805420 A3 20000628; EP 0805420 B1 20080625; DE 19617473 A1 19971106; DE 59712949 D1 20080807; US 6064994 A 20000516; US 6298337 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110422

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110422

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110422

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59712949

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59712949

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090326

2008-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712949 P 20080807

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061025

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7G 07B 17/02 B

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI