Global Patent Index - EP 0805421 A3

EP 0805421 A3 2000-06-28 - Method and arrangement for processing data in a mail processing system with a franking machine

Title (en)

Method and arrangement for processing data in a mail processing system with a franking machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Datenverarbeitung in einem Postverarbeitungssystem mit einer Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et arrangement pour le traitement de l'information dans un système de traitement de courrier avec une machine d'affranchissement

Publication

EP 0805421 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97250134 A

Priority

DE 19617476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805421A2] The data processing method has a first processing step in which each mail item is detected and scanned during its transport to a franking machine and a second step in which a processing routine is effected while the mail item is at the franking machine, for automatic insertion of a number of documents or inserts. A total value of the individual stored weights for the latter is used for selection of the most cost-effective carrier, with corresponding franking of the item. The documents or inserts can be provided by a number of personal computers (PCa,PCb,PCc) with associated printers (Da,Db,Dc), the individual document or insert weight multiplied by the number of documents or inserts received.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00379 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00491 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00774 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805421 A2 19971105; EP 0805421 A3 20000628; DE 19617476 A1 19971106; US 6226626 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091103

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030910

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7G 07B 17/02 B

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI