Global Patent Index - EP 0805422 A3

EP 0805422 A3 2000-06-28 - Method for determining the most economic dispatcher

Title (en)

Method for determining the most economic dispatcher

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ermittlung des günstigsten Beförderers

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer le tranporteur le plus économique

Publication

EP 0805422 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97250135 A

Priority

DE 19617557 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805422A2] The selection method provides the optimum carrier for the mail from a group of carriers entered during the setting up of the franking system, using entered information identifying the required service and the cost of the selected service for each carrier. The relative costs for the weighed mail item are compared to select the optimum carrier from the possible carriers providing the required service, based on cost, the calculated cost entered in the account of the selected carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00032 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0012 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00379 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00491 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805422 A2 19971105; EP 0805422 A3 20000628; DE 19617557 A1 19971106; US 6035291 A 20000307; US 6321214 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131031

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050428

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050428

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7G 07B 17/02 B

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI