Global Patent Index - EP 0805425 A3

EP 0805425 A3 2000-03-01 - Ordering and billing system for restauration installations

Title (en)

Ordering and billing system for restauration installations

Title (de)

Bestell- und Abrechnungssystem für Restaurationsbetriebe

Title (fr)

Système de prise de commandes et de facturation pour établissements de restauration

Publication

EP 0805425 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97810220 A

Priority

CH 108496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0805425A2] The ordering and charging system uses at least one computer system (100) with an input keyboard (120) and a processor (110) which is coupled to a display monitor (130) and a printer (140). The processor can receive an order entered via a hand-held reader (150) scanning a menu (M) with a bar code for each menu item, with calculation of the customer bill via menu information entered via the keyboard, for print-out via the printer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07G 1/00; G07F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/00 (2006.01); G07G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/00 (2013.01); G06Q 10/087 (2013.01); G07F 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0805425 A2 19971105; EP 0805425 A3 20000301; CH 690876 A5 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2000-05-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20000301

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07G 1/00 A, 7G 07F 7/00 B

1998-09-16 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: G07G 1/00

1998-09-02 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

1997-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970416

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL