Global patent index - EP 0805687 A4

EP 0805687 A4 2000-05-31 - RECOMBINANT HUMAN ALPHA-FETOPROTEIN AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

RECOMBINANT HUMAN ALPHA-FETOPROTEIN AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

REKOMBINANTES HUMANES ALPHA-FETOPROTEIN UND SEINE VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

ALPHA-F TOPROTEINE HUMAINE RECOMBINANTE ET SES UTILISATIONS

Publication

EP 0805687 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96905219 A

Priority

  • US 9600996 W
  • US 37730995 A
  • US 37731195 A
  • US 37731695 A
  • US 37731795 A
  • US 50501295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9622787A1] In general, disclosed are methods of inhibiting autoreactive immune cell proliferation in a mammal, involving administering to the mammal a therapeutically effective amount of recombinant human alpha-fetoprotein or an immune cell anti-proliferative fragment or analog thereof; methods of inhibiting a neoplasm in a mammal, involving administering to the mammal a therapeutically effective amount of recombinant human alpha-fetoprotein or an anti-neoplasm fragment or analog thereof; and methods of cell culture, involving the use of a media containing recombinant human alpha-fetoprotein or a fragment or analog thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/47; C12N 15/62; C12P 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/574 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4715 (2013.01); A61K 38/1709 (2013.01); A61K 47/48238 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 38/1709 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] JP H025866 A 19900110 - KANSAI SHIN GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO
  • [XA] EP 0353814 A2 19900207 - SCLAVO SPA [IT]
  • [A] US 5206153 A 19930427 - TAMAOKI TAIKI [CA], et al
  • [A] EP 0001812 A1 19790516 - HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]
  • [A] WO 9305774 A1 19930401 - WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US]
  • [A] MURGITA R. ET AL.: "Adult murine T cells activated in vitro by alpha-fetoprotein and naturally occurring T cells in newborn mice: identity in function and cell surface differentiation antigens", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 75, no. 6, 1978, pages 2897 - 2901, XP002118046
  • [A] BOISMENU R. ET AL.: "Expression of domains of mouse alpha-fetoprotein in Escherichia coli.", LIFE SCIENCES, vol. 43, no. 8, 1988, pages 673 - 681, XP002118047
  • See also references of WO 9622787A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9622787 A1 19960801; AU 4903596 A 19960814; AU 700975 B2 19990114; CA 2211324 A1 19960801; CA 2211324 C 20120710; CN 1150030 C 20040519; CN 1179106 A 19980415; EP 0805687 A1 19971112; EP 0805687 A4 20000531; HK 1010153 A1 20050311; JP 2008073041 A 20080403; JP H10513347 A 19981222

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20040708

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARTINEX R&D INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-06-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MURGITA, ROBERT, A

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020311

2000-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-12-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6C 12N 15/12 A, 6C 12N 15/62 B, 6C 07K 14/47 B, 6A 61K 38/17 B, 6C 07K 14/00 B, 6C 12P 21/02 B

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970801

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE