Global patent index - EP 0805725 B1

EP 0805725 B1 2000-10-04 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SQUEEZE CASTING

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SQUEEZE CASTING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRESSGISSEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE COULEE SOUS PRESSION

Publication

EP 0805725 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96900650 A

Priority

  • GB 9600137 W
  • GB 9501261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9622851A1] The invention relates to a squeeze casting for the production of high integrity, near net shape castings. Apparatus for casting metal articles comprises a receptacle for molten metal, at least one mould cavity for casting the metal article, the mould cavity being defined by co-operating die parts, the die parts being moveable with respect to each other and their separation distance being selected to define a predetermined cavity volume for the cast article, a conduit having a first end connected to an entrance in the lower die part of the mould cavity and a second end connected to the receptacle, means for transferring molten metal upwardly from the receptacle through the conduit to fill or substantially fill the mould cavity, sealing means being provided to seal the entrance to the mould cavity wherein pressurising means are provided to apply pressure on the die parts to further reduce the cavity volume during solidification of the metal in the mould cavity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 17/00; B22D 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9622851 A1 19960801; AU 4455296 A 19960814; AU 708985 B2 19990819; CA 2211140 A1 19960801; DE 69610550 D1 20001109; DE 69610550 T2 20010510; EP 0805725 A1 19971112; EP 0805725 B1 20001004; GB 9501261 D0 19950315; JP H10512811 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050123

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-09-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010328

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010117

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-01-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010104

2000-12-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-09

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001004

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAPERVISION LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971126

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970821

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE