Global patent index - EP 0805775 B1

EP 0805775 B1 2000-07-12 - ACTUATING MEANS FOR A LIFT DOOR CATCH

Title (en)

ACTUATING MEANS FOR A LIFT DOOR CATCH

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE AUFZUGSTÜRVERRIEGELUNG

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE MANOEUVRE DU VERROU D'UNE PORTE D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 0805775 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95942344 A

Priority

  • SE 9501544 W
  • SE 9404546 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620126A1] An actuating mechanism for a catch (3) of a hoist door (4) comprises a vertically displaceable operating member (16), which is associated with a vertically displaceable actuating member (46), by means of which the catch (3) may be released. A coupling mechanism is provided between the actuating member (46) and the operating member (16) and has a cam follower (36), which in engagement with a cam (56) locks the coupling mechanism in such a manner that a displacement of the operating member will be transferred to the actuating member (46) for the release of the door catch (3). When the cam (56) is absent no movement will be transferred to the actuating member (46). The cam (56) and the cam follower (36) are provided on a hoist cage at a landing, respectively, or vice versa, so that the door catch (3) may be released, only when the hoist cage is at a landing. The coupling mechanism is a toggle joint mechanism, having two pivotably connected link arms (28, 38), the cam follower (36) being associated with the common pivot (34) of the link arms (28, 38). The opposite ends of the link arms (28, 38) are connected to the operating member (16) and the actuating member (46), respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620126 A1 19960704; AU 4359496 A 19960719; AU 689361 B2 19980326; DE 69518013 D1 20000817; DE 69518013 T2 20010322; EP 0805775 A1 19971112; EP 0805775 B1 20000712; SE 511787 C2 19991122; SE 9404546 D0 19941228; SE 9404546 L 19960629

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-01-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151218

2015-12-23 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20151218

2015-12-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69518013

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518013

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990701

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970617

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL