Global Patent Index - EP 0805777 B1

EP 0805777 B1 2001-03-28 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING A LOAD

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR TRANSPORTING A LOAD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT EINER LAST

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRANSPORT D'UNE CHARGE

Publication

EP 0805777 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900518 A

Priority

  • DE 9600055 W
  • DE 19502421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19502421A1] In prior art processes for transporting a load using a crane from a starting position over obstacles to a target position, the transport process may be optionally manually or automatically controlled. To permit the secure automatic transport of a load without collisions by simple means, the transport movement within a predetermined area with unknown or changing obstacles (15) with the transport process manually controlled is recorded and used to find a free transport region (19); the automatic control of the transport process in the predetermined area is limited to the free transport region (19) found.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 13/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 13/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19502421 A1 19960801; DE 19502421 C2 19970327; EP 0805777 A1 19971112; EP 0805777 B1 20010328; GR 3035672 T3 20010629; WO 9622936 A1 19960801

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-20 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160116

2016-01-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606672

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-27 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59606672

- Effective date: 20140109

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070117

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060117

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060117

2005-01-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606672 20010503

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT NL

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971126

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970721

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT NL