Global Patent Index - EP 0805779 B1

EP 0805779 B1 2000-05-31 - COLLISION PROTECTION

Title (en)

COLLISION PROTECTION

Title (de)

KOLISIONSSCHUTZ

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES COLLISIONS

Publication

EP 0805779 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95944294 A

Priority

  • SE 9501590 W
  • SE 9500300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9622939A1] The present invention relates to a protection means in the case of collision for vehicles provided with forklifts, such as forklift trucks. The means is characterised in that it comprises a front shield (1) to which are secured two parallel fork tunnels or box girders (4) into which the forks are intended to be inserted, said fork tunnels/box girders (4) being provided with locking means (6, 7, 15) to lock the shield and fork tunnels to the forks when a load is raised thereon, and to release when the load has been placed on the ground or floor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 17/00; B60R 19/02; B66F 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/12 (2006.01); B66F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/12 (2013.01); B66F 17/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9622939 A1 19960801; DE 69517340 D1 20000706; DE 69517340 T2 20001207; EP 0805779 A1 19971112; EP 0805779 B1 20000531; FI 973127 A0 19970725; FI 973127 A 19970827; NO 973439 A 19970909; NO 973439 D0 19970725; SE 503915 C2 19960930; SE 9500300 D0 19950127; SE 9500300 L 19960728

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011227

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517340 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2000-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990730

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970807

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE