Global Patent Index - EP 0805789 A4

EP 0805789 A4 2000-09-06 - METHODS OF PREPARING GAS GENERANT FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

METHODS OF PREPARING GAS GENERANT FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GASERZEUGENDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE FORMULATIONS GENERATRICES DE GAZ

Publication

EP 0805789 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95906163 A

Priority

US 9500083 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9622954A1] Novel methods for processing gas generant compositions to produce feed stock are disclosed. The methods of the present invention include utilizing a binding agent and other additives in a mixture of ingredients of gas generant compositions in sufficient quantities that the ingredients of the gas generating material will agglomerate to form granules as the ingredients are mixed. Processing methods, including roll coating, continuous mixing, static mixing, freeze drying, solvent extraction, emulsification, azeotropic distillation, spray drying, fluidized bed processing and particle grinding are also disclosed for use in preparing feed stock for final gas generant products. The methods of the present invention are particularly useful in processing gas generating materials having a non-azide based fuel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05B 19/00; B01D 1/16; B01D 3/00; B22F 3/00; B22F 5/00; B22F 7/00; C06B 21/00; C22B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 21/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 21/0066 (2013.01); C06B 21/0091 (2013.01); C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9622954 A1 19960801; AU 1448695 A 19960814; EP 0805789 A1 19971112; EP 0805789 A4 20000906; JP H10512843 A 19981208; MX 9705711 A 19971031

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010801

2000-09-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 05B 19/00 A, 7C 22B 1/14 B, 7B 01D 1/16 B, 7B 01D 3/00 B, 7B 22F 3/00 B, 7B 22F 5/00 B, 7B 22F 7/00 B, 7C 06B 21/00 B

1999-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORDANT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE