Global Patent Index - EP 0805819 A4

EP 0805819 A4 2000-09-27 - CHIMERIC DNA-BINDING PROTEINS

Title (en)

CHIMERIC DNA-BINDING PROTEINS

Title (de)

CHIMÄRE DNA-BINDEPROTEINE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES CHIMERES DE LIAISON D'ADN

Publication

EP 0805819 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95944738 A

Priority

  • US 9516982 W
  • US 36608394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620951A1] Chimeric proteins containing composite DNA-binding regions are disclosed together with DNA constructs encoding them, compositions containing them and applications in which they are useful.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/00; A01K 67/00; C07K 14/47; C07K 19/00; C12N 15/00; C12P 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/22 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4702 (2013.01); C12N 9/22 (2013.01); C12N 15/1055 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GASHLER A L ET AL: "A NOVEL REPRESSION MODULE, AN EXTENSIVE ACTIVATION DOMAIN, AND A BIPARTITE NUCLEAR LOCALIZATION SIGNAL DEFINED IN THE IMMEDIATE- EARLY TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR EGR-1", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 13, no. 8, 1 August 1993 (1993-08-01), pages 4556 - 4571, XP000886453, ISSN: 0270-7306
  • [X] AURORA R ET AL: "SEGMENTS OF THE POU DOMAIN INFLUENCE ONE ANOTHER'S DNA-BINDING SPECIFICITY", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY 1992, vol. 12, no. 2, 1992, pages 455 - 467, XP000886485, ISSN: 0270-7306
  • [X] VERRIJZER C P ET AL: "THE OCT-1 POU DOMAIN MEDIATES INTERACTIONS BETWEEN OCT-1 AND OTHER POU PROTEINS", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY 1992, vol. 12, no. 2, 1992, pages 542 - 551, XP000886465, ISSN: 0270-7306
  • [X] STARK MARTHA R ET AL: "Interaction between two homeodomain proteins is specified by a short C-terminal tail.", NATURE (LONDON) 1994, vol. 371, no. 6496, 1994, pages 429 - 432, XP000887194, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [X] KIM YANG-GYUN ET AL: "Chimeric restriction endonuclease.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 1994, vol. 91, no. 3, 1994, pages 883 - 887, XP002136978, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [X] MARGOLIN JUDITH F ET AL: "Krueppel-associated boxes are potent transcriptional repression domains.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 1994, vol. 91, no. 10, 1994, pages 4509 - 4513, XP002136979, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • See also references of WO 9620951A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620951 A1 19960711; AT 544776 T 20120215; AU 4895096 A 19960724; AU 719001 B2 20000504; CA 2209183 A1 19960711; EP 0805819 A1 19971112; EP 0805819 A4 20000927; EP 0805819 B1 20120208; JP 3817739 B2 20060906; JP H10513344 A 19981222; US 2003126624 A1 20030703; US 2007150973 A1 20070628; US 2009100535 A1 20090416; US 7008780 B2 20060307; US 7485441 B2 20090203; US 7763446 B2 20100727

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151228

2016-01-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151228

2016-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-12-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69536228

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121229

2013-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121229

2013-09-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121231

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120519

2013-03-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69536228

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121109

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120208

2013-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20121109

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-09-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK05

- Ref Document Number: 544776

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120608

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-06-06 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: VDEP

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MARKS & CLERK (LUXEMBOURG) LLP

2012-04-05 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 69536228

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120405

2012-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2012-02-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 544776

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2012-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050714

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050714

2000-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07K 14/00 A, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 12P 21/00 B, 7A 01K 67/00 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7C 07K 19/00 B

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970721

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE