Global patent index - EP 0805906 B1

EP 0805906 B1 2000-05-31 - PROGRAMMABLE ELECTRONIC LOCKING DEVICE

Title (en)

PROGRAMMABLE ELECTRONIC LOCKING DEVICE

Title (de)

PROGRAMMIERBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VERSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE DE FERMETURE PROGRAMMABLE

Publication

EP 0805906 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96901007 A

Priority

  • FR 9600003 W
  • FR 9500822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9623122A1] A programmable electronic locking device comprising a lock (12) operated by means of a key (18) when a match is found between a lock identification code and a related key identification code. The lock comprises a plug (14) with a portion (14A) provided with at least one aperture (16) for receiving the key (18). The plug comprises at least one electrical connection means (39), an electronic control means with at least one memory means for storing at least one identification code, said means being connected to the one or more electrical connection means, and an unlocking means responsive to the electronic control means for unlocking the lock. The key comprises a first electrical connection means (19) engageable with the electrical connection means of the lock when the key is inserted into the corresponding aperture (16), a first electronic control means comprising at least one first memory means for storing at least one identification code, said means being connected to the first electrical connection means for transmitting an unlocking command to the lock, and a programming means controllable by a confidential code input means to alter the data in each of the electronic key and lock control means. A power supply means supplies power to the electronic key and lock control means and the plug unlocking means. A lock, a plug and a multifunctional key for use in said programmable electronic device are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00817 (2013.01); G07C 9/00857 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00761 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00841 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7441 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7791 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9623122 A1 19960801; AR 000786 A1 19970924; AT 193577 T 20000615; AU 4490096 A 19960814; AU 687664 B2 19980226; BG 101795 A 19980227; BG 62981 B1 20001229; BR 9606857 A 19971125; CA 2211256 A1 19960801; CN 1149329 C 20040512; CN 1169173 A 19971231; CZ 9702388 A3 19971217; DE 69608665 D1 20000706; DE 69608665 T2 20010222; EA 000207 B1 19981224; EE 03314 B1 20001215; EG 21255 A 20010530; EP 0805906 A1 19971112; EP 0805906 B1 20000531; ES 2150097 T3 20001116; FI 973026 A0 19970717; FI 973026 A 19970717; FR 2729700 A1 19960726; FR 2729700 B1 19970704; HU 221771 B1 20030128; HU 9702401 A2 19980330; HU 9702401 A3 19991228; IL 116714 A 20010111; IL 116714 D0 19960514; JO 1886 B 19960725; JP H10512638 A 19981202; KR 19987001682 A 19980625; MA 23777 A1 19961001; MX 9705614 A 19980628; NO 973420 A 19970924; NO 973420 D0 19970724; NZ 300228 A 19971219; OA 10739 A 20021211; PL 180493 B1 20010228; PL 321537 A1 19971208; RO 119245 B1 20040630; SK 97797 A3 19980114; TN SN96012 A1 19980319; TR 9700690 T1 19980221; TW 304215 B 19970501; US 6331812 B1 20011218; ZA 9600166 B 19960821

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160104

2016-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160103

2016-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-03-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-02-24 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK9A

2016-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 193577

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160103

2016-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-01-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150109

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ACSYS IP HOLDING, LB

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130422

2013-06-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130422

2013-04-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-03-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AL AZEM IT HOLDINGS, LB

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130115

2013-03-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ACSYS IP HOLDING, LB

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130115

2013-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20121212

2013-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130115

2013-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-01-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AL AZEM IT HOLDINGS INC., LC

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20121207

2012-12-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2004-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-07-07 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030707

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-07-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030702

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150097

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-09-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2000-07-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608665

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19970724;LV PAYMENT 19970724;SI PAYMENT 19970724

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

2000-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193577

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990714

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970725

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 970724;LV PAYMENT 970724;SI PAYMENT 970724