Global Patent Index - EP 0805909 A4

EP 0805909 A4 2000-10-25 - HYBRID TWO-PHASE TURBINE

Title (en)

HYBRID TWO-PHASE TURBINE

Title (de)

HYBRIDE ZWEIPHASENTURBINE

Title (fr)

TURBINE HYBRIDE A DEUX PHASES

Publication

EP 0805909 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95910885 A

Priority

  • US 9501044 W
  • US 87860592 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5385446A] A rotary separator turbine having inlet structure for mixtures of gas and liquid, rotary shaft structure comprising separator structure to receive the mixture of gas and liquid and to separate the mixture into a stream of gas and at a stream of liquid; first structure to receive the stream of gas for generating torque exerted on the shaft structure, and; second structure to receive the stream of liquid for generating torque exerted on the shaft structure; whereby the first and second structure separately operate to generate shaft power.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 17/00 (2006.01); B01D 19/00 (2006.01); F01D 1/00 (2006.01); F01D 1/32 (2006.01); F01D 15/00 (2006.01); F01D 25/32 (2006.01); F01K 21/00 (2006.01); F01K 25/04 (2006.01); F03G 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 25/04 (2013.01); B01D 17/00 (2013.01); B01D 19/0052 (2013.01); F01D 1/00 (2013.01); F01D 1/32 (2013.01); F01D 15/00 (2013.01); F01D 25/32 (2013.01); F01K 21/005 (2013.01); F03G 7/04 (2013.01); F05D 2210/13 (2013.01); F05D 2240/36 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B01D 17/00 + B01D 17/0217 + B01D 17/044

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9623129A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5385446 A 19950131; AT 237740 T 20030515; AU 1868295 A 19960814; AU 698268 B2 19981029; DE 69530420 D1 20030522; DE 69530420 T2 20040115; EP 0805909 A1 19971112; EP 0805909 A4 20001025; EP 0805909 B1 20030416; ES 2197194 T3 20040101; US 5525034 A 19960611; WO 9623129 A1 19960801

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-02-04 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150125

2015-01-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69530420

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140125

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197194 T3

2003-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69530420 P 20030522

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970820

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE