Global Patent Index - EP 0805915 B1

EP 0805915 B1 2000-03-22 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING SUBSTANCES IN GAS AND VAPOUR FORM IN A STREAM OF EXHAUST AIR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR REMOVING SUBSTANCES IN GAS AND VAPOUR FORM IN A STREAM OF EXHAUST AIR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABLUFTREINIGUNG GAS- UND DAMPFFÖRMIGER STOFFE IN EINEM ABLUFTSTROM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR ELIMINATION DE SUBSTANCES SOUS FORME DE GAZ ET DE VAPEUR DANS UN COURANT D'AIR EVACUE

Publication

EP 0805915 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900497 A

Priority

  • CH 9600033 W
  • CH 19095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9623134A1] In a device for removing substances in gas and vapour form in a stream of exhaust air (18) with an active material on the surface of a carrier, the exhaust air flows through the substrate arranged in a housing (68) with gas inlet (90) and outlet stubs (78). In the housing (68) there are several axially separated cartridges (12) closed on one side, with an indeformable, perforated inner casing and an outer casing permeable to gases with little resistance as a carrier with the active material for the catalysis, adsorption or transformation of organic dusts and aerosols into gas placed on its surface. The cartridges (12) are assembled into at least one removable insert (70) or removable modules, each with individually releasable cartridges (12). The device makes it possible to purify gaseous and vapour flows of exhaust air at varying and low charges and low temperatures, where the devices may be spatially andlocally separated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; B01D 53/04; F23J 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F23G 7/06 (2006.01); F23G 7/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/07 (2013.01); F01N 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9303112 A1 19930218 - HANSEN RONALD PETER [AU]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9623134 A1 19960801; AT 191061 T 20000415; AU 4429496 A 19960814; DE 59604776 D1 20000427; EP 0805915 A1 19971112; EP 0805915 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2005-01-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050124

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-09-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-09-10 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-01-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-01-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. PIOVESANA PAOLO

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604776 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191061 T 20000415

1998-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980108

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970725

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE