Global Patent Index - EP 0806030 B1

EP 0806030 B1 2000-08-30 - l/4-SOUND ABSORBER

Title (en)

l/4-SOUND ABSORBER

Title (de)

l/4-SCALLABSORBER

Title (fr)

AMORTISSEUR DE BRUIT l/4

Publication

EP 0806030 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96900025 A

Priority

  • CH 9600002 W
  • CH 22695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9623294A1] Sound absorbers of a plurality of tubular resonators (10), the sound apertures Ao of which border a common surface A and are distributed in such a way that the interaction regions Aw of said individual sound apertures Ao are distributed so as to cover the largest surface possible while not substantially overlapping. Preferred embodiments consist of extruded plastic mouldings (7, 9) of suitable mechanical rigidity and acoustic inertia.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 11/172; G10K 11/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/02 (2006.01); G10K 11/16 (2006.01); G10K 11/172 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/172 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9623294 A1 19960801; AR 000728 A1 19970806; BR 9606802 A 19971230; CH 690143 A5 20000515; CN 1173937 A 19980218; DE 59605821 D1 20001005; EP 0806030 A1 19971112; EP 0806030 B1 20000830; ES 2150092 T3 20001116; JP 3778935 B2 20060524; JP H10512687 A 19981202; PT 806030 E 20010131; US 5959265 A 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030107

2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030104

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030107

2003-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030105

2003-01-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030104

2002-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020129

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020107

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-11-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150092 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605821 20001005

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RIETER AUTOMOTIVE (INTERNATIONAL) AG

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990330

1997-11-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VAN LIGTEN, ROBERT, H.

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE