Global Patent Index - EP 0806155 B1

EP 0806155 B1 2002-09-04 - Rig for folding the edge of the upper onto a last in a footwear manufacturing machine

Title (en)

Rig for folding the edge of the upper onto a last in a footwear manufacturing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Falten einer Kante des Oberleders auf einer Leiste von einer Schuhherstellungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pliage des bords d'une empeigne sur une forme d'une machine pour la fabrication de chaussures

Publication

EP 0806155 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96830263 A

Priority

EP 96830263 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806155A1] For perfect folding of the edge of the upper over a last, in a footwear manufacturing machine which provides for supporting the last (A), to which the insole (B) is applied, and over which the upper (C) is tautened, for gripping and stretching the upper (C), for keeping the last (A) secured, and for folding the upper (C) over the insole (B) in the area of the forepart of the shoe in order to fix the upper to the insole, there are provided flexible elements (28) arranged on opposite sides of the last (A) in the vicinity of a middle part of the shoe which are movable between a retracted position in which they are withdrawn from the last (A) and an advanced position in which they embrace the flanks of the last (A), thereby folding the upper (C) under the insole (B) below the level of the folding means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 21/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806155 A1 19971112; EP 0806155 B1 20020904; DE 69623442 D1 20021010; DE 69623442 T2 20030430; ES 2180723 T3 20030216; PT 806155 E 20030131

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090508

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090508

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-11-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20091109

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080605

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040520

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: OFFICINE MECCANICHE *MOLINA & BIANCHI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-04-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180723 T3

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021129

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623442 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OFFICINE MECCANICHE MOLINA & BIANCHI S.P.A.

2001-11-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RIG FOR FOLDING THE EDGE OF THE UPPER ONTO A LAST IN A FOOTWEAR MANUFACTURING MACHINE

2001-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RIG FOR FOLDING THE EDGE OF THE UPPER ONTO A LAST IN A FOOTWEAR MANUFACTURING MACHINE

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980212

1998-01-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1997-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;SI