Global Patent Index - EP 0806160 A3

EP 0806160 A3 2000-02-02 - Rotary disc brush comprising plaited steel wires

Title (en)

Rotary disc brush comprising plaited steel wires

Title (de)

Scheibenrundbürste mit gezopften Stahldrähten

Title (fr)

Brosse rotative annulaire à fils métalliques tressés

Publication

EP 0806160 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97107287 A

Priority

DE 29608399 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806160A2] Rotary brush comprising plaited steel wires (2) in which the wires at least in the outer region are bonded with an elastic plastic. Pref. plastics include polyurethane, a hot melt adhesive, partic. from the gp. of polyolefins and polyamides, thermoplastic block copolymer with elastic properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/055 (2006.01); A46B 7/08 (2006.01); A46B 9/12 (2006.01); A46B 13/00 (2006.01); B24D 13/04 (2006.01); B24D 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/10 (2013.01); A46B 9/12 (2013.01); A46B 13/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29608399 U1 19960808; EP 0806160 A2 19971112; EP 0806160 A3 20000202; JP H1086068 A 19980407; MX 9703004 A 19980531

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020727

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE