Global Patent Index - EP 0806161 B1

EP 0806161 B1 2001-05-23 - Linkage system for displacement of an inner movable element in a corner cupboard

Title (en)

Linkage system for displacement of an inner movable element in a corner cupboard

Title (de)

Hebelsystem zum Verschieben eines in einem Eckmöbelelement verschiebbar gehaltenen inneren Einbauteils

Title (fr)

Système de liens pour le déplacement d'un élément amovible intérieur dans un placard de coin

Publication

EP 0806161 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810290 A

Priority

EP 96810290 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806161A1] The system comprises a lever (18) with two arms (16,17) which is pivotable. One of the levers is effectively connected to a rail, which after withdrawal of an outer installation part from the corner furniture item (1), is pivotable around a vertical pivot axis (11). The second lever is connected to a coupling rod, which for its part is connected with the inner installation part. The lever with two arms is formed from at least one full or hollow profile, in the central area of which a bearing component (15) is fitted, which is located in a bearing part (14) fixed in the corner furniture component, so that the lever is pivotable in a plane, which is vertical to the vertical pivot axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 46/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806161 A1 19971112; EP 0806161 B1 20010523; AT 201309 T 20010615; DE 59606959 D1 20010628; US 5941620 A 19990824

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140506

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090506

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090506

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080506

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606959 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201309 T 20010615

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1998-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971216

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI