Global Patent Index - EP 0806164 B1

EP 0806164 B1 2000-08-16 - Device and method for the mounting of furnishings and wash-stands on a wall

Title (en)

Device and method for the mounting of furnishings and wash-stands on a wall

Title (de)

Montageeinrichtung und Verfahren zur Montage von Möbeln und Waschplatzelementen an einer Wand

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la fixation d'ameublement et des meubles de toilette à une paroie

Publication

EP 0806164 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107441 A

Priority

  • DE 19619025 A
  • DE 19628210 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806164A1] Connected to the support component (10) and longitudinally displaceable in relation to it are one or more fixture components (20) which fix it to the wall. One or more suspension components (30) are longitudinally displaceable in relation to the support component and are releasably suspendable on it. They are each connected to an item of furniture or a washroom component. The suspension components are integrated parts of an item of furniture or a washroom component. The support component is tubular with a circular outer cross-section, and has a through slot (12) on one side. Relative to the slot, in the interior (11) of its hollow cross-section, it has an inwardly extending, longitudinal stabilisation rib part (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/06 (2006.01); A47K 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/067 (2013.01); A47K 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806164 A1 19971112; EP 0806164 B1 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040521

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALAPE ADOLF LAMPRECHT K.G.

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-06-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-01-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702178 20000921

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI NL

2000-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980415

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971119

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI NL