Global Patent Index - EP 0806249 B1

EP 0806249 B1 2000-10-04 - Manually actuated pump

Title (en)

Manually actuated pump

Title (de)

Handbetätigte Pumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à main

Publication

EP 0806249 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107573 A

Priority

DE 19618711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806249A2] The hand pump consists of a casing (30) with a cylinder (34), a fixing device (40, 44), a suction tube (78) and a first one-way valve (80) between the suction tube and the cylinder. A piston (120), a pump shaft (50) with through channel (54), and a dispensing head (60) are also present. The piston has a pre-tensioning spring. There is a second one-way valve (140) between the cylinder and the shaft channel. The dispensing head has a sealing cap (65). To form a permanent covering region, the cap overlaps and seals a projecting end (73) of the cylinder liner (7) in each position of the pump shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3059 (2013.01); B05B 11/3023 (2013.01); B05B 11/306 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806249 A2 19971112; EP 0806249 A3 19980812; EP 0806249 B1 20001004; DE 19618711 A1 19971113; DE 19618711 B4 20040923

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING GMBH, 44319 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 59702420

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702420

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702420

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702420

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702420

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-06-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702420

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-01-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702420

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702420 20001109

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991105

1999-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990129

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1998-01-09 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: INGG. GUZZI RAVIZZA

1997-12-12 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1997-12-03 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE