Global Patent Index - EP 0806288 B1

EP 0806288 B1 2001-04-04 - Press, especially for compressing plate-like workpieces

Title (en)

Press, especially for compressing plate-like workpieces

Title (de)

Presse, insbesondere zum Verpressen von plattenförmigen Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Presse, notamment pour le pressage de pièces planes

Publication

EP 0806288 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107097 A

Priority

EP 96107097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806288A1] At least two benches - one a fixed (3) bench and the other a lifting (2) platform - adjoin a pressure chamber (4). The press (1) has a coupling system (11) for at least one press (1a,1b) over or under it. The connection has at least one plug-in part in at least one bench for a passage through. The benches can be in at least two pieces and have superimposed work tops (7,8) whose hollow interiors contain honeycombed reinforcement ridges (14). The benches may be arranged with a permeating opening (11), and that the coupling system may have five openings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 7/02; B27D 3/02; B30B 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 3/02 (2006.01); B30B 7/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/062 (2013.01); B27D 3/02 (2013.01); B30B 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29622858 U1 19970703; AT 200245 T 20010415; DE 59606722 D1 20010510; EP 0806288 A1 19971112; EP 0806288 B1 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-05-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-10-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606722 20010510

2001-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010506

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

2001-04-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200245 T 20010415

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990622

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971205

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL PT

1997-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI