Global Patent Index - EP 0806353 B1

EP 0806353 B1 2002-09-04 - Machine for the automated manufature of infusion bags

Title (en)

Machine for the automated manufature of infusion bags

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum automatischen Herstellen von Aufgussbeuteln

Title (fr)

Machine pour la fabrication automatisée de sachets d'infusion

Publication

EP 0806353 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97830192 A

Priority

IT BO960259 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806353A1] A machine for the manufacture of bags (1) containing infusionable substances comprises a succession of work stations ordered along a pass line (A): a station (5) from which a film divided into two strips (2, 3) is directed toward a station (8) where measures of the substance are dispensed onto one of the strips (2), followed by a station (11) at which the two united strips (2, 3) are heat sealed together to form one continuous strip; passing first through a longitudinal cutting station (12) then through a transverse cutting station (14), the strip is divided up into individual bags (1) which are stacked at a further station (16) in the requisite number for a given packaging format. The single stations are driven by relative motors (8m, 11m, 14m, 16m) independently of and in concert with one another, adopting a control system whereby the angular position of the relative machine axis (8x, llx, 14x, 16x) is monitored electrically, and one such axis (14x) provides a master axis to which the others are subordinate. The axes (8x, 11x, 14x, 16x) are all interlocked to a monitoring and control unit (21) such as will verify their angular position relative to one other in the light of variable operating parameters, namely the pattern of the single bag, production tempo and packaging format. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 29/02; B65B 57/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 29/02 (2006.01); B65B 57/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/16 (2013.01); B65B 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806353 A1 19971112; EP 0806353 B1 20020904; DE 69715079 D1 20021010; DE 69715079 T2 20030430; IT 1285927 B1 19980626; IT BO960259 A1 19971110; IT BO960259 D0 19960509

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110424

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100424

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100424

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100409

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090504

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715079 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001011

1998-05-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980311

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT