Global Patent Index - EP 0806370 B1

EP 0806370 B1 2000-06-28 - Cask

Title (en)

Cask

Title (de)

Gebinde

Title (fr)

Fût

Publication

EP 0806370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810269 A

Priority

CH 114996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806370A1] A metal can (1) has a rim (11) at the upper limit of its necked side-wall (3). A membrane (13) is fixed to the highest point (S) of the rim (11), providing an air-tight seal for the esp. powder can contents. The can is closed by a plastic lid (7) whose flexible outer rim (19) clips over the can rim. The outer diameter D1 of the can rim is less than the diameter D2 of the can sidewall. The flange may be sealed by a peelable or pull off membrane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/10 (2006.01); B65D 51/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/20 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0018 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806370 A1 19971112; EP 0806370 B1 20000628; DE 59701928 D1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-04-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020419

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701928 20000803

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981221

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980508

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI