Global Patent Index - EP 0806467 B1

EP 0806467 B1 2000-12-27 - Process and apparatus for the thermal conversion of hydrocarbons into more insaturated aliphatic hydrocarbons by combination of a steam cracking and a pyrolysis step

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the thermal conversion of hydrocarbons into more insaturated aliphatic hydrocarbons by combination of a steam cracking and a pyrolysis step

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur thermischen Umsetzung von Kohlenwasserstoffen zu ungesättigten aliphatischen Kohlenwasserstoffen durch Kombination einer Dampfkrackung und einer Pyrolysestufe

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de conversion thermique d'hydrocarbures en hydrocarbures aliphatiques plus insaturés que les produits de départ, combinant une étape de vapocraquage et une étape de pyrolyse

Publication

EP 0806467 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400998 A

Priority

FR 9605760 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806467A1] A process for the continuous pyrolysis and de-coking in a reaction zone comprises a pyrolysis zone (40) made of a refractory material and consisting of heating and cooling zones. The heating zone comprises at least 2 rows (1.2) parallel to the axis of the reactor separated by a partition (70) of refractory material between successive rows. One of the rows receives hydrocarbons and water vapour and the other mainly water vapour. The rows comprise parallel heaters (8) encased in sheaths (7) perpendicular to the axis of the reactor. Coke deposits in the reaction zone. The C2+ hydrocarbon charge , at a temperature suitable for vapour cracking, circulates in vapour cracking zone containing at least 2 tubes coupled to supplies of the charge and water vapour. One of the tubes is supplied only with water vapour to provide for de-coking of the tube. The wt. ratio of water/charge is between 0.5 - 20. The vapour cracking current is circulated through a row of the pyrolysis zone and the de-coking current circulates through another row. The exit temperature of the currents from the pyrolysis reactor is at least 850 degrees C and hydrocarbons containing at least one acetylenic compound are recovered. Also claimed is a pyrolysis and de-coking unit for effecting the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 9/16; C10G 51/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 4/04 (2006.01); C07C 5/35 (2006.01); C07C 11/24 (2006.01); C10G 9/16 (2006.01); C10G 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 51/023 (2013.01); C10G 9/16 (2013.01); Y10S 585/95 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806467 A1 19971112; EP 0806467 B1 20001227; AU 2002997 A 19971113; AU 726569 B2 20001109; CA 2204541 A1 19971106; CA 2204541 C 20080715; DE 69703763 D1 20010201; DE 69703763 T2 20010419; ES 2154448 T3 20010401; FR 2748273 A1 19971107; FR 2748273 B1 19980626; ID 17841 A 19980129; JP 4251303 B2 20090408; JP H10279507 A 19981020; NO 314507 B1 20030331; NO 972070 A 19971107; NO 972070 D0 19970505; US 5976352 A 19991102; US 6322760 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120503

2013-08-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120502

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703763

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120502

2013-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120502

2012-12-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU *PETROLE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GAZ DE FRANCE

- Effective date: 20120531

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110519

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110601

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GAZ DE FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAZ DE FRANCE, INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, , FR

- Document: DE 69703763

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GAZ DE FRANCE, INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, , FR

- Document: DE 69703763

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GAZ DE FRANCE, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GAZ DE FRANCE, PARIS, FR; INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 69703763

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: GAZ DE FRANCE, PARIS, FR; INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 69703763

- Effective date: 20110329

2006-01-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-05-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-05-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154448 T3

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703763 20010201

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-10-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DATA SOLLECITO LETT. INC.:02/03/2001;DE DOMINICIS

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL SE