Global Patent Index - EP 0806504 B1

EP 0806504 B1 2000-11-02 - Centralized control device for thread clamps of creels

Title (en)

Centralized control device for thread clamps of creels

Title (de)

Zentralverstelleinrichtung für Fadenklemmen von Spulengattern

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage centralisé pour des pinces-fil de cantres

Publication

EP 0806504 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107061 A

Priority

DE 29608167 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806504A1] A central actuator for thread clamps belonging to a creel of reels has, for each row of reels, positioning rods (50) capable of vertical displacement on which, for each thread clamp (14), a control ramp (49) is formed to shift a spring-loaded bolt (31) which sets the clamp in an open or a clamping position. With each positioning rod is associated a vertically driven shifting lever (51) which acts on the rod to allow it to rest in a first position corresponding to the clamp open setting from which it can be shifted into a second position corresponding to the clamping position. The shifting lever acts on an adjusting part (60) which can be smoothly adjusted and fixed vertically on the rod while a stop (57) can be similarly set on the rod so that the spring-loaded bolt rests on the ramp in a position to support the clamp in its second or clamping position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 13/24; D02H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 1/00 (2006.01); D02H 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 1/00 (2013.01); D02H 13/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29608167 U1 19970918; EP 0806504 A1 19971112; EP 0806504 B1 20001102; ES 2151203 T3 20001216

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-03-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151203

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000131

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971111

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI