Global Patent Index - EP 0806505 B1

EP 0806505 B1 2001-05-30 - Cleaning cloth

Title (en)

Cleaning cloth

Title (de)

Reinigungstextil

Title (fr)

Tissu de nettoyage

Publication

EP 0806505 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106517 A

Priority

DE 29608084 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806505A1] The cleaning cloth (10) is worked together with chenille yarns (11) over the whole surface, or in zones. The surface can be coated with a synthetic or natural product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 27/18; A47L 1/15; A47L 13/16; D04B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/16 (2006.01); D03D 27/18 (2006.01); D06N 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 27/18 (2013.01); A47L 13/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29608084 U1 19960613; AT 201727 T 20010615; DK 0806505 T3 20010806; EP 0806505 A1 19971112; EP 0806505 B1 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2005-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-09 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2002-11-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020420

2002-04-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020419

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703641 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201727 T 20010615

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991223

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970920

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI NL SE