Global Patent Index - EP 0806517 B1

EP 0806517 B1 2002-09-04 - Laundry dryer

Title (en)

Laundry dryer

Title (de)

Wäschetrockner

Title (fr)

Séchoir à linge

Publication

EP 0806517 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97890083 A

Priority

AT 83196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806517A2] A laundry drying frame has a vertical stand (2) equipped with a lower foot (1). The top stand end carries a flat folding structure (3), which comprises a support arm (4) and folding frames (6,7) located on each side of the support arm (2). The support arm (4) is connected tiltably to the stand (2) and can be fixed horizontally on the stand (2). Each tilting frame (6,7) contains two transverse supports (10), which are connected tiltably to the support arm (4) and carry the washing lines (8,9), and longitudinal supports (11), which connect the two transverse supports together (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 57/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806517 A2 19971112; EP 0806517 A3 19980520; EP 0806517 B1 20020904; AT 410557 B 20030625; AT A83196 A 20021015; DE 59708102 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708102

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-12-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WUESTER, HEINRICH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WUESTER, HEINRICH, AT

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120505

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120505

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110503

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708102 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010213

1998-12-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981028

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL