Global Patent Index - EP 0806531 B1

EP 0806531 B1 2000-09-27 - Lock with axial (de)coupling for car lock mechanism

Title (en)

Lock with axial (de)coupling for car lock mechanism

Title (de)

Axial (ent)kuppelndes Schloss für ein Schlossmechanismus eines Personenkraftwagens

Title (fr)

Verrou à débrayage axial pour un mécanisme de serrure de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0806531 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97106600 A

Priority

FR 9605831 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806531A1] A lock consists of a stator (14), an intermediate cylinder (16) and a rotor (12) which can be fixed relative to the stator by locking elements and released by a key to allow a control lever (24) to be turned. It also has an indexer (28) which can move axially between rest and disengaged positions, and a transmission member (26) which can be locked relative to the stator. The transmission member (26) has two tubular sections - a large diameter rear section and a small diameter front section, the rear section being equipped with an outer radial collar on which the indexer (28) is mounted. The indexer is fixed from axial movement but is able to rotate freely, while a radial lug (106) on the transmission member engages with a recess (108) in the stator when the member is in its disengaged position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/04 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5416 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7576 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7706 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7712 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7932 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7949 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806531 A1 19971112; EP 0806531 B1 20000927; AR 007031 A1 19991013; BR 9703109 A 19981006; DE 69703178 D1 20001102; DE 69703178 T2 20010517; ES 2151202 T3 20001216; FR 2748513 A1 19971114; FR 2748513 B1 19980626; US 5732580 A 19980331

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170421

2017-05-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170421

2017-04-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69703178

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150423

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150422

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE, CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 69703178

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69703178

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151202 T3

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703178 20001102

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GARNAULT, JOEL

2000-09-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MENAGER, CHRISTOPHE

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980417

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT