Global Patent Index - EP 0806534 B1

EP 0806534 B1 2003-06-04 - Espagnolette

Title (en)

Espagnolette

Title (de)

Treibstangenschloss

Title (fr)

Crémone

Publication

EP 0806534 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97113389 A

Priority

  • DE 4322457 A
  • DE 4405816 A
  • EP 94105749 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806534A2] A catch (7) is alternately operable from a closure cylinder or similar. A change lever (30) is movable from the first position into a third change operating position by the drive shaft connecting slide (27). A drive shaft press-back spring (45) is tensioned by a stop surface (27') provided for the drive shaft connecting slide on transition from the first to the third position. Its elasticity is sufficient to move the drive shaft connecting slide automatically back into the first position. Two counter-running drive shaft connecting slides (27, 28) are provided, which are driven by a final wheel (26) of a gearwheel gear engaging with its driven teeth in that of the drive shaft connecting slide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02; E05B 63/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/06 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 63/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4405816 A1 19950119; DE 4405816 C2 20021121; EP 0806534 A2 19971112; EP 0806534 A3 19980311; EP 0806534 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090414

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090414

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080404

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59410294 P 20030710

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0633379 P

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FUHR GMBH & CO. KG

2000-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000105

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980522

1998-03-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

1997-11-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 633379

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT