Global Patent Index - EP 0806543 B1

EP 0806543 B1 2001-01-24 - Drilling apparatus for percussive drilling

Title (en)

Drilling apparatus for percussive drilling

Title (de)

Bohrvorrichtung für das schlagende Bohren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de perçage pour le forage à percussion

Publication

EP 0806543 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97105661 A

Priority

DE 19618298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806543A1] The bore head with the hammer is connected to a bore rod and possibly at least to a flow channel axially running in the bore rod. The bore head (10) cross-sectionally narrows from a hammer-type end disc (26) to the chisel or bore point (28) in several stages (26,27, 27a-27g), whereby the stage edges determine a cone cover (K). The axial heights (b) of the stages and/or their width may be approximately of the same size. The stages can be determined by the crown arrangement, the pins of which are outwardly inclined in the advance direction. The ratio of the diameter of the end disc to the diameter of the chisel or bore point is preferable approximately 7:1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/06 (2006.01); E21B 7/26 (2006.01); E21B 10/38 (2006.01); E21B 10/40 (2006.01); E21B 10/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/40 (2013.01); E21B 7/068 (2013.01); E21B 7/26 (2013.01); E21B 7/265 (2013.01); E21B 10/38 (2013.01); E21B 10/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806543 A1 19971112; EP 0806543 B1 20010124; AT 198923 T 20010215; DE 19618298 A1 19971113

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEISERT ENGINEERING G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-05-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030417

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030405

2003-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-25 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020425

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HIEBSCH & PEEGE AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702945 20010301

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU

2001-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198923 T 20010215

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990304

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-01-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU