Global Patent Index - EP 0806562 B1

EP 0806562 B1 2001-03-21 - Cylinderhead for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cylinderhead for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zylinderkopfanordnung einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culasse pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0806562 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106334 A

Priority

DE 19618401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19618401C1] The arrangement comprises a common flange plane (19) in which at least two separate oil supply channels (54,59) are formed, which are separated from each other by an intermediary seal (20). A first channel is formed between the seal and a first housing component part (3) and a second channel (54,59) is located between the seal and a second housing component part (2). In the seal at least one through passage is formed, through which individual sections at least of one of the channels are connected to one another. One of the housing component parts is a basic housing (2) which has gas exchange channels (7) and valve guides (6) and is fitted on a cylinder block (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/42; F01M 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/06 (2006.01); F01M 9/10 (2006.01); F01M 11/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/4214 (2013.01); F01M 9/104 (2013.01); F01M 11/02 (2013.01); F01M 9/105 (2013.01); F01M 9/108 (2013.01); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01); F02F 1/242 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19618401 C1 19970703; EP 0806562 A1 19971112; EP 0806562 B1 20010321; JP H1047155 A 19980217; US 5845616 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070417

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070417

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070417

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703163 20010426

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000724

1998-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980407

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT