Global patent index - EP 0806616 B1

EP 0806616 B1 2000-01-05 - Sealed wall-hung boiler with reduced size heating parts

Title (en)

Sealed wall-hung boiler with reduced size heating parts

Title (de)

Raumdichter Wand-Durchlauferhitzer mit verkleinerter Baugrösse der Beheizteile

Title (fr)

Chaudière murale étanche avec des éléments de chauffage de volume réduit

Publication

EP 0806616 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97500054 A

Priority

ES 9601064 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806616A2] The boiler (1) comprises a casing (2) of reduced height (35) and depth (33) for housing in a cabinet, a small-sized burner (7) and heating parts (6,7,8,8',9) of reduced width and depth, which are situated on one side of the boiler (1) housing, while the water circuit (15) components (16 to 23) are located on the other side. The whole of the air flow (26) needed for combustion, both the primary and the secondary, is channelled from the intake (14) from the exterior by means of a diffuser (12) via a flat conduit (25) attached to the rear panel (32) of the casing, which terminates in a sealed enclosure (25b) below the burner, from where it is distributed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/02; F24H 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0089 (2013.01); F24H 9/02 (2013.01); F24H 2203/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806616 A2 19971112; EP 0806616 A3 19981118; EP 0806616 B1 20000105; DE 69701056 D1 20000210; ES 2136495 A1 19991116; ES 2136495 B1 20000701

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070319

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070319

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-06-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-04-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-04-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-03-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69701056

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL PT

2000-01-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990317

1999-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981118

1998-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL PT

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL PT