Global patent index - EP 0806619 A3

EP 0806619 A3 2000-01-12 - Improved framework for supporting droppings which can be used in a tunnel for drying droppings

Title (en)

Improved framework for supporting droppings which can be used in a tunnel for drying droppings

Title (de)

Tragwerk zur Unterstützung von Tierkot, welches in einem Tunnel zur Trocknung von Tierkot anwendbar ist

Title (fr)

Ossature pour supporter la fiente pouvant être utilisé dans un tunnel pour sécher la fiente

Publication

EP 0806619 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97106630 A

Priority

IT MI960934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806619A2] Equipment for storage and ventilation of droppings in a droppings drying tunnel (12), comprising a support structure (13) for a plurality of longitudinally extending surfaces (16) for supporting and holding droppings, wherefrom said droppings are periodically loaded and unloaded, and means of ventilation of the droppings. Said means of ventilation of the droppings comprise for each surface (16) for supporting and holding the droppings a respective set of ventilation blades (30) longitudinally aligned one in respect of the other and evenly spaced along said support and holding surface (16), and means for driving movement of said blades for ventilating the air inside said drying tunnel (12) over the droppings of the respective support and holding surface (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 21/00; F26B 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 17/04 (2006.01); F26B 17/08 (2006.01); F26B 21/00 (2006.01); F26B 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/00 (2013.01); F26B 17/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806619 A2 19971112; EP 0806619 A3 20000112; IT 1282977 B1 19980403; IT MI960934 A1 19971110; IT MI960934 A3 19971110; IT MI960934 D0 19960509; JP H1047856 A 19980220

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL