Global Patent Index - EP 0806710 B1

EP 0806710 B1 2000-08-16 - Stabilisation of an electronic circuit for regulating the mechanical movement of a timepiece

Title (en)

Stabilisation of an electronic circuit for regulating the mechanical movement of a timepiece

Title (de)

Stabilisation einer elektronischen Schaltung zur Regelung des mechanischen Gangwerks einer Zeitmessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Stabilisation d'un circuit électronique de régulation du mouvement mécanique d'une piéce d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 0806710 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97107371 A

Priority

FR 9605720 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806710A1] The movement is driven by a source of electrical energy including a magnetised rotor (3a) and an inductive winding (3b). Rotation by a coil spring (2) produces an alternating voltage (Ug) between a reference terminal (B0) and a terminal (B1) connected to a full-wave rectifier (5), which supplies the regulatory circuit (1). During each revolution a measuring pulse (IM) is generated (Trig) and compared (Cmp) with a reference signal (FR) from a fixed-frequency oscillator (Osc). When a pulse occurs in advance of the reference signal the rotor is braked, advantageously by a transistor switch (K) receiving a pulse (IF) from a delay register (Tmr).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 10/00; G04C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 17/00 (2006.01); G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04C 10/00 (2006.01); G04C 10/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/00 (2013.01); G04C 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806710 A1 19971112; EP 0806710 B1 20000816; EP 0806710 B2 20080123; CN 1114137 C 20030709; CN 1165989 A 19971126; DE 69702811 D1 20000921; DE 69702811 T2 20010322; DE 69702811 T3 20080814; FR 2748583 A1 19971114; FR 2748583 B1 19980626; HK 1005106 A1 20040408; JP 4065345 B2 20080326; JP H1048355 A 19980220; SG 63704 A1 19990330; TW 330252 B 19980421; US 5740131 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69702811

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ASULAB S.A.

- Free text: ASULAB S.A.#FAUBOURG DU LAC 6#CH-2501 BIENNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ASULAB S.A.#RUE DES SORS 3#2074 MARIN (CH)

2008-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2008-01-23 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080123

2008-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ASULAB S.A.

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050505

2005-05-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050505

2004-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CONSEILS ET MANUFACTURES VLG SA

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702811 20000921

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991005

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI