Global Patent Index - EP 0806712 B1

EP 0806712 B1 2002-09-04 - Mechanical watch-movement with incorporated chronometer movement (chronograph movement)

Title (en)

Mechanical watch-movement with incorporated chronometer movement (chronograph movement)

Title (de)

Mechanisches Uhrwerk mit integrierter Stoppuhr (Chronographenwerk)

Title (fr)

Mouvement d'horlogerie mécanique avec chronomètre incorporé (mouvement de chronographe)

Publication

EP 0806712 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107582 A

Priority

CH 116696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806712A2] The chronograph mechanism has a mechanically operated winding shaft and/or a rotor (1) used for driving a spring housing. The mechanism incorporates an alarm mechanism for providing an acoustic alarm signal, operated from a second spring housing (7) which is coupled to the winding shaft or the rotor directly or via an intermediate gearing. The second spring housing may lie in the same plane as the main spring housing, with a central display for indicating the alarm time and an additional setting shaft for activating and de-activating the alarm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 1/14 (2006.01); G04B 1/12 (2006.01); G04B 13/00 (2006.01); G04B 23/02 (2006.01); G04B 35/00 (2006.01); G04F 7/00 (2006.01); G04F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 23/02 (2013.01); G04B 1/12 (2013.01); G04F 7/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806712 A2 19971112; EP 0806712 A3 19990915; EP 0806712 B1 20020904; CH 689470 A5 19990430; DE 59708103 D1 20021010; JP H1073671 A 19980317

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708103

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160602

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708103

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708103 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020308

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI