Global Patent Index - EP 0806713 B1

EP 0806713 B1 2002-09-25 - Control device with a tunable standby-oscillator

Title (en)

Control device with a tunable standby-oscillator

Title (de)

Steuerschaltung mit nachstimmbarem Standby-Oszillator

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande avec un oscillateur de mise en veille accordable

Publication

EP 0806713 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107367 A

Priority

DE 19618094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806713A1] The circuit can be switched into a standby mode during periods in which control is not required and is switched back to full operating mode for short wake-up periods during standby operation. A full operation stage only operates during full operating mode and contains a relatively high current consuming main oscillator (MOSC). A standby mode stage operates during full and standby operating modes and contains a tunable, low frequency accuracy oscillator (SBOSC) with low current consumption. The standby oscillator is retuned using the main oscillator during wake-up periods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 3/02; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/48 (2014.01); G04G 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/48 (2013.01); G04G 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806713 A1 19971112; EP 0806713 B1 20020925; DE 19618094 A1 19971120; DE 19618094 C2 19990602; US 5973617 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170504

2017-05-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170504

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070505

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990802

1998-06-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980415

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT