Global Patent Index - EP 0806781 B1

EP 0806781 B1 2002-09-11 - A circuit for the protected supply of an electrical load

Title (en)

A circuit for the protected supply of an electrical load

Title (de)

Schaltung zur geschützten Versorgung einer elektrischen Last

Title (fr)

Circuit pour l'alimentation protégée d'une charge électrique

Publication

EP 0806781 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400951 A

Priority

FR 9605956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806781A1] The load (M) may be a single-phase or polyphase motor fed from a three-phase network (U,V,W) via an electromechanical switch (20) and an inverse-parallel thyristor switch (30) operated by a controller (40), which energises the coil (53) of a shunt contactor (50) connected in series with a resistor or transformer (60) across the thyristor switch. The resistor or transformer establishes a DC voltage (V) across the thyristor switch when the contactor is closed. Its impedance is chosen such that the thyristor switch is rendered conductive when an overcurrent appears and closes the shunt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/54 (2006.01); H01H 73/00 (2006.01); H02H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 89/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/542 (2013.01); H01H 9/548 (2013.01); H01H 89/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806781 A1 19971112; EP 0806781 B1 20020911; AU 2009897 A 19971113; AU 716799 B2 20000309; BR 9703106 A 19980630; CZ 293753 B6 20040714; CZ 9701423 A3 19981216; DE 69715296 D1 20021017; DE 69715296 T2 20030612; FR 2748612 A1 19971114; FR 2748612 B1 19980619; TW 463440 B 20011111; US 5953189 A 19990914; ZA 9703974 B 19971202

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160429

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160428

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2016-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715296

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150410

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-03-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69715296

- Effective date: 20111228

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715296 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980512

1997-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT SE