Global Patent Index - EP 0806962 A4

EP 0806962 A4 2001-01-10 - METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ACID ASPIRATION-INDUCED ACUTE LUNG INJURY

Title (en)

METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ACID ASPIRATION-INDUCED ACUTE LUNG INJURY

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DURCH SÄUREATMUNG VERURSACHTER AKUTER LUNGENVERLETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE LESION PULMONAIRE AIGUE INDUITE PAR LE SYNDROME DE MENDELSON

Publication

EP 0806962 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96903731 A

Priority

  • US 9601150 W
  • US 37707795 A
  • US 45404295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9622785A1] Lung injury from acid aspiration is treated by administering an IL-8-binding substance, such as anti-IL-8-antibody, to the patient following the acid aspiration.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A61K 38/16; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/435; C07K 14/715; C07K 16/00; C07K 16/24; C07K 16/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/24 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/244 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DX] V. BROADDUS ET AL.: "Neutralization of IL-8 inhibits neutrophil influx in a rabbit model of endotoxin-induced pleurisy.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 152, no. 6, 15 March 1994 (1994-03-15), Baltimore, MD, USA, pages 2960 - 2967, XP000604775
  • [DX] M. MULLIGAN ET AL.: "Inhibition of lung inflammatory reactions in rats by an anti-human IL-8 antibody.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 150, no. 12, 15 June 1993 (1993-06-15), Baltimore, MD, USA, pages 5585 - 5595, XP000604925
  • [X] V. BROADDUS ET AL.: "Interleukin-8 is a major neutrophil chemotactic factor in pleural liquid of patients with empyema.", AMERICAN REVIEW OF RESPIRATORY DISEASES, vol. 146, no. 4, 1992, New York, NY, USA, pages 825 - 830, XP000603436
  • [X] A. BOYLAN ET AL.: "Evidence of a role for mesothelial cell-derived interleukin 8 in the pathogenesis of asbestos-induced pleurisy in rabbits.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, vol. 89, no. 4, 1992, New York, NY, USA, pages 1257 - 1267, XP000603440
  • [X] A. HARADA ET AL.: "Essential involvement of interleukin-8 (IL-8) in acute inflammation.", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, vol. 56, no. 5, November 1994 (1994-11-01), New York, NY, USA, pages 559 - 564, XP000960610
  • [X] R. ST.JOHN ET AL.: "Immunologic therapy for ARDS, septic shock, and multiple organ failure.", CHEST, vol. 103, no. 3, 1993, Chicago, IL, USA, pages 932 - 943, XP000603807
  • [X] G. PACE ET AL.: "Recent advances in the treatment of the acute respiratory distress syndrome.", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, vol. 5, no. 1, January 1995 (1995-01-01), London, GB, pages 23 - 30, XP000960612
  • [PX] H. FOLKESSON ET AL.: "Acid aspiration-induced lung injury in rabbits is mediated by interleukin-8-dependent mechanisms.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, vol. 96, no. 1, July 1995 (1995-07-01), New York, NY, USA, pages 107 - 116, XP000960674
  • See also references of WO 9622785A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9622785 A1 19960801; AU 4771696 A 19960814; CA 2211115 A1 19960801; EP 0806962 A1 19971119; EP 0806962 A4 20010110; JP H10512278 A 19981124

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030806

2001-01-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

1998-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROADDUS, VIRGINIA, C.

1998-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATTHAY, MICHAEL, A.

1998-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FOLKESSON, HANS, G.

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970822

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE