Global Patent Index - EP 0806965 A4

EP 0806965 A4 2000-06-07 - CD44 EXPRESSION IN SMOOTH MUSCLE CELLS

Title (en)

CD44 EXPRESSION IN SMOOTH MUSCLE CELLS

Title (de)

CD44 EXPRESSION IN GLATTEN MUSKELZELLEN

Title (fr)

EXPRESSION DE CD44 DANS LES CELLULES DES MUSCLES LISSES

Publication

EP 0806965 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95910105 A

Priority

  • US 9500740 W
  • US 18315694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9519183A1] Disclosed are methods of treating arteriosclerosis or vascular restenosis by inhibiting CD44-mediated smooth muscle migration or proliferation as well as methods of screening for the identification of compounds capable of inhibiting the expression of CD44, inhibiting the CD44-mediated migration of smooth muscle cells, and inhibiting the CD44-mediated proliferation of smooth muscle cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/08 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/70585 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XP] WO 9407505 A1 19940414 - NORPHARMCO INC [CA], et al
  • [Y] BRUHN H.D. ET AL.: "Untersuchung zur Pathogenese der Arteriosklerose.", MEDIZINISCHE WELT, vol. 33, no. 10, March 1982 (1982-03-01), pages 347 - 351, XP000882890
  • [Y] B. YANG ET AL.: "Identification of a common hyaluronan binding motif in the hyaluronan binding proteins RHAMM, CD44 and link protein.", EMBO J., vol. 13, no. 2, 15 January 1994 (1994-01-15), pages 286 - 296, XP002134781
  • [AX] PICKER ET AL.: "Monoclonal antibodies to human lymphocytes homing receptors define a novel class of adhesion molecules on diverses cell types", J. CELL. BIOL., vol. 109, no. 2, 1989, pages 927 - 938, XP000881846
  • [A] LANGE R. ET AL.: "Southwestern Internal Medicine Conference : Restenosis, the Achilles heel of coronary angioplasty.", AM. J. MED. SCI., vol. 306, no. 4, October 1993 (1993-10-01), pages 265 - 275, XP000881860
  • See also references of WO 9519183A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9519183 A1 19950720; AU 1832695 A 19950801; AU 689226 B2 19980326; CA 2179391 A1 19950720; EP 0806965 A1 19971119; EP 0806965 A4 20000607; JP H09508265 A 19970826

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2000-06-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960719

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE