Global Patent Index - EP 0807051 B1

EP 0807051 B1 2000-04-05 - A HULL STRUCTURE FOR MULTI-HULL SHIPS

Title (en)

A HULL STRUCTURE FOR MULTI-HULL SHIPS

Title (de)

RUMPFFORM FÜR MEHRRUMPFSCHIFFE

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE COQUE POUR BATEAUX MULTICOQUES

Publication

EP 0807051 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96902903 A

Priority

  • DK 9600075 W
  • DK 18295 A
  • DK 9500469 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9625322A1] Hull construction for a multi-hull vessel, which hull has in vertical thwartship planes a generally symmetrical cross section and sides which each describe a generally S-shaped curve, the fore half of the hull presenting the feature that the inflection point V1 for the lower part of the S-shaped hull curve is below the deadweight line and at a minimum height above the base line of the hull amounting to 50 % of the distance between the base line and the deadweight line, and that the inflection point V2 for the upper part of the S-shaped hull curve is above the deadweight line and at a minimum height above the base line of the hull amounting to 125 % of the distance between the base line and the deadweight line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9625322 A1 19960822; AU 4712896 A 19960904; AU 708359 B2 19990805; DE 69607600 D1 20000511; DE 69607600 T2 20001214; DK 0807051 T3 20000821; EP 0807051 A1 19971119; EP 0807051 B1 20000405; ES 2150657 T3 20001201; GR 3033911 T3 20001130; PT 807051 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-10-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040220

2005-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Free text: 20020207 *AUSTAL SHIPS PTY LTD:100 CLARENCE BEACH ROAD, HENDERSON 6166 WESTERN

2002-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Free text: 20020207 *AUSTAL SHIPS PTY LTD

2002-12-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-12-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-07-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2002-06-28 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: AUSTAL SHIPS PTY LTD AU

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-06-28 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: FREDERIKSHAVN VAERFT A/S DK

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-06-28 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Free text: FREDERIKSHAVN VAERFT A/S DK

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-04-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: AUSTAL SHIPS PTY LTD.

2002-04-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: FREDERIKSHAVN VAERFT A/S

2002-03-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-28 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20020128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150657 T3

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-08-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2000-05-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607600 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT MC NL PT SE

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990301

1997-11-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970915

1997-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT MC NL PT SE